TX HB2308 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-28)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procedures in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship filed by the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship filed by the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Sponsors

Rep. Gary Gates [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]
Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. David Cook [R]Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]
Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D]
Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]
Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]
Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]

Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#757 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#757
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-04HouseAmended 2-Wu
2021-05-04HouseAmended 1-Ramos
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2308
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02308I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02308H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02308E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02308S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02308H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02308H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02308I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02308H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02308H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02308E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02308E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2308&RcdVtNo=757&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback