TX HB2307 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the retention by a managed care organization of certain money recovered as a result of a fraud or abuse investigation under Medicaid or the child health plan program.
Title
Relating to the retention by a managed care organization of certain money recovered as a result of a fraud or abuse investigation under Medicaid or the child health plan program.
Sponsors
Rep. Lacey Hull [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB935 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB935 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB935 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
FRAUD
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--General
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--General
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions