TX HB2307 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the award of grants by the Texas Workforce Commission to facilitate the participation of certain veterans and military personnel in apprenticeship training programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the award of grants by the Texas Workforce Commission to facilitate the participation of certain veterans and military personnel in apprenticeship training programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB337 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Passed to 3rd reading
HB1884 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback