TX HB2305 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a work group on enhancing the training and credentialing of emergency management personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a work group on enhancing the training and credentialing of emergency management personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#282 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-11HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#282
2019-04-11HousePassed
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback