TX HB2305 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to motor vehicle inspections; creating an offense; changing the collection method for certain fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicle inspections; creating an offense; changing the collection method for certain fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-26 - House - HB 2305Third Reading House (Y: 126 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - HB 2305Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 See remarks for effective date
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2013-05-26SenateRecord vote
2013-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2013-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2013-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-26HouseRecord vote
2013-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2013-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2013-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2013-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2013-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2013-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2013-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2013-05-24SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2013-05-24SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2013-05-24SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2013-05-24HouseHouse appoints conferees
2013-05-24HouseHouse requests conference committee
2013-05-24HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2013-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2013-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2013-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenatePassed
2013-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2013-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21SenateAmendment amended
2013-05-21SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2013-05-21SenateVote reconsidered
2013-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21SenateAmended
2013-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-21SenateRead 2nd time
2013-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-22SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-09SenateReferred to Transportation
2013-05-09SenateRead first time
2013-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-08HouseRecord vote
2013-05-08HousePassed
2013-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-08HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-05-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-30HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-11HouseReferred to Transportation
2013-03-11HouseRead first time
2013-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback