TX HB2298 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Commission on Fire Protection.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Commission on Fire Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-02 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
FIRE PROTECTION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
FOREST SERVICE, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
FIRE PROTECTION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
FOREST SERVICE, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions