TX HB2291 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the payment of restitution to certain individuals depicted in child pornography and to increasing the punishment for certain individuals convicted of the offense of possession or promotion of child pornography.
Title
Relating to the payment of restitution to certain individuals depicted in child pornography and to increasing the punishment for certain individuals convicted of the offense of possession or promotion of child pornography.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] |
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - HB 2291Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 2291Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 2291Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-30 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-29 | House | House requests conference committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PORNOGRAPHY
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PORNOGRAPHY