TX HB2286 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the criminal consequences of engaging in certain conduct with respect to certain firearm accessories and prohibiting the enforcement of certain federal laws related to certain firearm accessories.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the criminal consequences of engaging in certain conduct with respect to certain firearm accessories and prohibiting the enforcement of certain federal laws related to certain firearm accessories.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1286 (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Amended RV#1246 (Y: 101 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-14SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1286
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1246
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-09HouseAmended 1-Oliverson
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback