TX HB2285 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Left pending in subcommittee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Left pending in subcommittee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of and criminal offenses occurring near certain child-care facilities and age restrictions on persons employed by or allowed on the premises of a sexually oriented business; creating criminal offenses; increasing criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to the regulation of and criminal offenses occurring near certain child-care facilities and age restrictions on persons employed by or allowed on the premises of a sexually oriented business; creating criminal offenses; increasing criminal penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Day Care
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Day Care
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES