TX HB2280 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale, development, or acquisition of certain property by certain navigation districts, including the Port of Houston Authority of Harris County, Texas; removing authority to own certain property, acquire certain property, and make related changes to the board of commissioners and name of the navigation district; requiring the sale or development of certain property.
Title
Relating to the sale, development, or acquisition of certain property by certain navigation districts, including the Port of Houston Authority of Harris County, Texas; removing authority to own certain property, acquire certain property, and make related changes to the board of commissioners and name of the navigation district; requiring the sale or development of certain property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2280 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02280I.htm |