TX HB2279 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-11)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prohibition against sexual harassment in the workplace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prohibition against sexual harassment in the workplace.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseCorrected committee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCorrected comm. report distributed
2019-04-30HouseCorrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB46 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback