TX HB2269 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement for and the contents of a declarations page required for certain standard insurance policy forms for personal automobile insurance.
Title
Relating to a requirement for and the contents of a declarations page required for certain standard insurance policy forms for personal automobile insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. John Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-14 | House | Amended 1-J. Turner |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility