TX HB2269 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operations of the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact waste disposal facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operations of the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact waste disposal facility.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1021 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback