TX HB2269 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the civil liability of a hospital with a children's isolation unit and of certain hospital employees.
Title
Relating to the civil liability of a hospital with a children's isolation unit and of certain hospital employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Hospitals
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Hospitals
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety