TX HB2267 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the sale and purchase of retail fireworks permits from an Internet website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the sale and purchase of retail fireworks permits from an Internet website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#297 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#297
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-30HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback