TX HB2267 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice of acceptance or rejection of an insurance claim.
Title
Relating to notice of acceptance or rejection of an insurance claim.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-12 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2011-04-12 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Insurance | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |