TX HB2261 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Considered in public hearing
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the physician education loan repayment program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the physician education loan repayment program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#215 (Y: 130 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - Read 2nd time RV#185 (Y: 122 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#215
2019-04-09HousePassed
2019-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-08HouseRecord vote RV#185
2019-04-08HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB998 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback