TX HB226 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a commission to review certain penal laws of this state and to make certain recommendations regarding those laws, to criminal offenses previously compiled in statutes outside the Penal Code, to repealing certain of those offenses, and to conforming punishments for certain of those offenses to the penalty structure provided in the Penal Code; increasing the punishment for the criminal offenses of sedition, sabotage, and capital sabotage; imposing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to the creation of a commission to review certain penal laws of this state and to make certain recommendations regarding those laws, to criminal offenses previously compiled in statutes outside the Penal Code, to repealing certain of those offenses, and to conforming punishments for certain of those offenses to the penalty structure provided in the Penal Code; increasing the punishment for the criminal offenses of sedition, sabotage, and capital sabotage; imposing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Craig Goldman [R] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] |
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#194 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-09 | House | Record vote RV#194 |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-08 | House | Amended 2-Cyrier |
2019-04-08 | House | Amended 1-Krause |
2019-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CERTAIN PENAL LAWS, COMMISSION TO STUDY
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
SUPREME COURT
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
SUPREME COURT