TX HB2258 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to developing a strategic plan for the improvement and expansion of high-quality bilingual education.
Title
Relating to developing a strategic plan for the improvement and expansion of high-quality bilingual education.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
Rep. Eddie Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB560 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Bilingual
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Bilingual
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS