TX HB2255 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to newborn and infant hearing screening results and the provision of information following a screening.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to newborn and infant hearing screening results and the provision of information following a screening.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Amended RV#259 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-10SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-10HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-09HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-08HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenatePassed
2019-05-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-10HouseRecord vote RV#259
2019-04-10HousePassed as amended
2019-04-10HouseAmended 1-Darby
2019-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1912 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback