TX HB225 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procedure for an application for a writ of habeas corpus based on certain new evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procedure for an application for a writ of habeas corpus based on certain new evidence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#979 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#979
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-10HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1004 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback