TX HB2247 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a demonstration program at the State Office of Risk Management for real-time processing of workers' compensation authorizations of payment for medical services and medical bills.
Title
Relating to a demonstration program at the State Office of Risk Management for real-time processing of workers' compensation authorizations of payment for medical services and medical bills.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Shine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |