TX HB2244 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring municipalities to reimburse the Texas Department of Transportation for compensation paid for certain signs required to be relocated due to road construction.
Title
Relating to requiring municipalities to reimburse the Texas Department of Transportation for compensation paid for certain signs required to be relocated due to road construction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |