TX HB2227 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to preventing the loss of benefits by certain retirees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas who resume service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to preventing the loss of benefits by certain retirees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas who resume service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1007 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#1007
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-02HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-02HouseAmended 1-Wu
2019-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback