TX HB2225 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to creating a committee to review the process for finding permanent placements for children in the conservatorship of the state.
Title
Relating to creating a committee to review the process for finding permanent placements for children in the conservatorship of the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. Ken Legler [R] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Patrick Rose [D] | Rep. Mark Shelton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-25 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-23 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed as amended | |
2009-04-28 | Amended | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-27 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-27 | Amended | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |