TX HB2223 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the exemption of certain commercial weighing or measuring devices from registration and inspection requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the exemption of certain commercial weighing or measuring devices from registration and inspection requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#135 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Effective immediately
2019-05-17 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-06 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-06SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-06HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-05HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-03HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenatePassed
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Agriculture
2019-04-04SenateRead first time
2019-04-03SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-02HouseRecord vote RV#135
2019-04-02HousePassed
2019-04-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB581 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback