TX HB2222 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the confidentiality of home address information of certain victims of family violence, sexual assault or abuse, stalking, or trafficking of persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the confidentiality of home address information of certain victims of family violence, sexual assault or abuse, stalking, or trafficking of persons.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-05HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-02-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback