TX HB2207 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the allocation of certain constitutional transfers of money to the economic stabilization fund, the state highway fund, the oil and gas regulation and cleanup account, the Texas emissions reduction plan fund, the property tax relief fund, and the Texas severance tax revenue and oil and natural gas (Texas STRONG) defense fund and to the permissible uses of money deposited to the Texas severance tax revenue and oil and natural gas (Texas STRONG) defense fund.
Title
Relating to the allocation of certain constitutional transfers of money to the economic stabilization fund, the state highway fund, the oil and gas regulation and cleanup account, the Texas emissions reduction plan fund, the property tax relief fund, and the Texas severance tax revenue and oil and natural gas (Texas STRONG) defense fund and to the permissible uses of money deposited to the Texas severance tax revenue and oil and natural gas (Texas STRONG) defense fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. Richard Hayes [R] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] | Rep. Angelia Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#828 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#773 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#773 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#828 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#773 |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR111 (Enabling for) 2023-05-04 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Governor
Oil & Gas
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--State
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Governor
Oil & Gas
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--State
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF