TX HB2203 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the powers of certain regional transportation authorities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the powers of certain regional transportation authorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#582
2021-04-30HousePassed
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-12HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-31HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB762 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Meeting cancelled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2203
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02203I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02203S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02203I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02203H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02203E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02203E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02203S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02203S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2203&RcdVtNo=582&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback