TX HB2202 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposition of fees collected by or on behalf of the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the disposition of fees collected by or on behalf of the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-04 - House - HB 2202Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | See remarks for effective date | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-04 | House | Passed |
2013-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-10 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration