TX HB2202 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Summary
Relating to protective orders against family violence.
Title
Relating to protective orders against family violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Valinda Bolton [D] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D] | Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. David Leibowitz [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-27 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1986 (Same As) 2009-03-05 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence