TX HB2200 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the medical use of marihuana; providing a defense to prosecution for possession of marihuana.
Title
Relating to the medical use of marihuana; providing a defense to prosecution for possession of marihuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-04-05 | House | Correction in referral |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MARIHUANA
PHYSICIANS
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MARIHUANA
PHYSICIANS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2200 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02200I.htm |