TX HB22 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-04 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-04 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the extension of additional state aid for tax reduction provided to certain school districts.
Title
Relating to the extension of additional state aid for tax reduction provided to certain school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-04 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#68 (Y: 61 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-08-02 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#39 (Y: 138 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#39 (Y: 138 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-04 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2017-08-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-02 | House | Calendars Committee rule adopted |
2017-08-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-08-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-07-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--School District
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--School District