TX HB2197 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Lottery Commission; providing penalties; imposing and changing fees.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Lottery Commission; providing penalties; imposing and changing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - HB 2197Third Reading House (Y: 87 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - HB 2197Third Reading House (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 9 by Hunter (Y: 91 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 6 by Smithee (Y: 94 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - HB 2197Third Reading House (Y: 92 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - HB 2197Third Reading House (Y: 110 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - HB 2197Third Reading House (Y: 65 N: 81 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 4 by Walle (Y: 45 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - HB 2197Third Reading House (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 9 by Hunter (Y: 91 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 6 by Smithee (Y: 94 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - HB 2197Third Reading House (Y: 92 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - HB 2197Third Reading House (Y: 110 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - HB 2197Third Reading House (Y: 65 N: 81 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 4 by Walle (Y: 45 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-23 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-24 | House | Passed as amended |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-04-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2013-04-23 | House | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration |
2013-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2013-04-23 | House | Amended |
2013-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment as amended fails of adoption |
2013-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment amended |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2013-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment amended |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-04-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-04-23 | House | Postponed |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |