TX HB2194 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing a "Made in Texas" labeling program.
Title
Relating to establishing a "Made in Texas" labeling program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#2061 (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#540 (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#540 (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#2061 |
2023-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#540 |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1109 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1109 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1109 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
ADVERTISING
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
PACKAGING & LABELING REQUIREMENTS
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
PACKAGING & LABELING REQUIREMENTS