TX HB2193 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of an inclusive sports program by the University Interscholastic League to provide students with disabilities access to team sports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of an inclusive sports program by the University Interscholastic League to provide students with disabilities access to team sports.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB776 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback