TX HB2186 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 80-41)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to suicide prevention training for educators in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to suicide prevention training for educators in public schools.

Sponsors

Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Patricia Harless [R]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Carol Alvarado [D]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]
Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]
Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. Myra Crownover [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Gary Elkins [R]
Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Joe Farias [D]Rep. Marsha Farney [R]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]
Rep. Allen Fletcher [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Rick Galindo [R]
Rep. Helen Giddings [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Larry Gonzales [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]
Rep. Eric Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. James Keffer [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Susan King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Marisa Marquez [D]
Rep. Trey Fischer [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Ruth McClendon [D]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]
Sen. Borris Miles [D]Rep. Doug Miller [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D]
Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Rene Oliveira [D]Rep. John Otto [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Gilbert Pena [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Debbie Riddle [R]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Kenneth Sheets [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. David Simpson [R]
Rep. Wayne Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Scott Turner [R]
Rep. Sylvester Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]
Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Molly White [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]
Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]
Sen. Donna Campbell [R]

Roll Calls

2015-05-29 - House - HB 2186Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - HB 2186Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective immediately
2015-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-06-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-29SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-29HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2015-05-29HouseRecord vote
2015-05-29HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenatePassed
2015-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-27SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-13SenateReferred to Education
2015-05-13SenateRead first time
2015-05-11SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07HouseRecord vote
2015-05-07HousePassed as amended
2015-05-07HouseAmended
2015-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-05-06HouseAmended
2015-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-12HouseReferred to Public Education
2015-03-12HouseRead first time
2015-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback