TX HB2180 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application of prescription drug price rebates to reduce health benefit plan enrollee cost sharing.
Title
Relating to the application of prescription drug price rebates to reduce health benefit plan enrollee cost sharing.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] | Rep. Jacey Jetton [R] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] |
Rep. Eddie Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Health Care Reform, Select |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Filed |