TX HB218 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the abolition of student loan default or breach of a student loan repayment or scholarship contract as a ground for nonrenewal or other disciplinary action in relation to a professional or occupational license and to certain duties of state agencies and political subdivisions in relation to delinquent or defaulted student loans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the abolition of student loan default or breach of a student loan repayment or scholarship contract as a ground for nonrenewal or other disciplinary action in relation to a professional or occupational license and to certain duties of state agencies and political subdivisions in relation to delinquent or defaulted student loans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#384 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#352 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#384
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#352
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB37 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback