TX HB218 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-4)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to improper relationships between educators and students; creating a criminal offense and expanding the applicability of an existing offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to improper relationships between educators and students; creating a criminal offense and expanding the applicability of an existing offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2017-03-14HouseReferred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback