TX HB2177 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to establishing a digital course materials pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to establishing a digital course materials pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-10 Effective immediately
2023-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2023-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-22HouseSenate passage reported
2023-05-21SenateRecord vote
2023-05-21SenatePassed
2023-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-21SenateRecord vote
2023-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-05-21SenateRecord vote
2023-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2023-05-21SenateRecord vote
2023-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2023-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2023-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2023-05-17SenateVote taken in committee
2023-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-12SenateReported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
2023-05-12SenateConsidered by subcommittee
2023-05-04SenateReferred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
2023-05-04SenateRead first time
2023-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2023-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2023-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#791
2023-05-02HousePassed
2023-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2023-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-02HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2023-04-28HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2023-04-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2023-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-20HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2023-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Higher Education
2023-03-09HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2240 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Co-author authorized
SB2240 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2177
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02177I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02177H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02177E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02177S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02177F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02177I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02177H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB02177H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02177E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2177&RcdVtNo=791&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2023
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=30
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=31

Bill Comments

feedback