TX HB2176 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reporting and expiration dates of a temporary health insurance risk pool administered by the commissioner of insurance.
Title
Relating to the reporting and expiration dates of a temporary health insurance risk pool administered by the commissioner of insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB874 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately