TX HB2174 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to restricting access to pornographic materials on certain websites and creating civil liability for certain actions that allow children to access pornographic materials.
Title
Relating to restricting access to pornographic materials on certain websites and creating civil liability for certain actions that allow children to access pornographic materials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PORNOGRAPHY
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PORNOGRAPHY