TX HB2169 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility requirements for a license to carry a handgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility requirements for a license to carry a handgun.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#667 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#667
2021-05-04HousePassed
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback