TX HB2169 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reporting concerning female prisoners who are confined in county jails and to the provision of feminine hygiene products to female prisoners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reporting concerning female prisoners who are confined in county jails and to the provision of feminine hygiene products to female prisoners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1779 (Y: 109 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#799 (Y: 131 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1779
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-01SenateRead first time
2019-04-30SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#799
2019-04-30HousePassed
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback