TX HB2163 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the types of vehicles regulated as neighborhood electric vehicles.
Title
Relating to the types of vehicles regulated as neighborhood electric vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1211 (Y: 113 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1211 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1863 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Transportation