TX HB216 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to residential mortgage loans, including the financing of residential real estate purchases by means of a wrap mortgage loan; providing licensing and registration requirements; authorizing an administrative penalty.
Title
Relating to residential mortgage loans, including the financing of residential real estate purchases by means of a wrap mortgage loan; providing licensing and registration requirements; authorizing an administrative penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Lina Ortega [D] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Sergio Munoz [D] |
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-04 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 43 |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB43 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Effective on 1/1/22
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
LOANS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
SAVINGS & MORTGAGE LENDING, DEPARTMENT OF
Business & Commerce--General
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
LOANS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
SAVINGS & MORTGAGE LENDING, DEPARTMENT OF