TX HB2159 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study on state land use to facilitate health and wellness for veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study on state land use to facilitate health and wellness for veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback