TX HB2157 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to equal parenting orders in suits affecting the parent-child relationship.
Title
Relating to equal parenting orders in suits affecting the parent-child relationship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Co-author authorized