TX HB215 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 81-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 81-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reporting and certification requirements by certain physicians regarding certain abortions.
Title
Relating to reporting and certification requirements by certain physicians regarding certain abortions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-04 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#65 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-08-03 - House - Point of order overruled RV#56 (Y: 92 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-04 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#65 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-08-03 - House - Point of order overruled RV#56 (Y: 92 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2017-08-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-08-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-08-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Passed |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-08-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-08-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-08-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-08-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-08-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-04 | House | Passed |
2017-08-04 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-08-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-08-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-08-03 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-08-03 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-08-03 | House | Amended |
2017-08-03 | House | Amended |
2017-08-03 | House | Amended |
2017-08-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-08-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-08-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-08-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-08-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-07-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-07-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-07-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-07-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-18 | House | Filed |